Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, D. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Brooks, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Hill, Jackson, Jones, Knotts, Luedtke, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to repeal provisions relating to election of circuit court judges; requiring the Governor, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a qualified person to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of the circuit court; altering the term of office of circuit court judges from 15 to 10 years; requiring the Governor to reappoint a circuit court judge, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, upon the expiration of the judge's term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0179
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0582 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 2, 21A, 3, 5, 5B )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM