Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; altering certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; authorizing the Board to levy a civil fine of not more than $50,000 for certain violations under certain circumstances; altering from a misdemeanor to a felony certain penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-321, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page