Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Corporate Returns - Disclosure of Settlement Payments to Governmental Units
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain corporations to attach to the Maryland income tax return a certain statement identifying certain settlement payments to governmental units under certain circumstances; requiring that certain statements be treated as confidential taxpayer information; requiring the Comptroller to collect and compile certain information and to submit, on or before March 1 each year, a certain annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Corporate Returns - Disclosure of Settlement Payments to Governmental Units
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-804, 10-804.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM