Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Harper, A. Miller, Serafini, Stukes, Summers, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 25% of the amount of a donation to a qualified permanent endowment fund at an eligible community foundation; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation and the Comptroller, on or before January 31 of each taxable year, the donations that the Department has approved for tax credit certificates during the prior year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0486
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305363/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-14)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {305363/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-14) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-305, 10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM