Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment Zones
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Manufacturing Empowerment Zone Program to encourage business entities engaged in manufacturing outside the State to invest in manufacturing facilities within the State; authorizing the Secretary of Commerce to designate specified areas of the State as manufacturing empowerment zones; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to grant specified property tax credits; authorizing specified business entities to claim a specified credit against the State income tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-1501 through 5-1506 )
(   10-207, 10-737 )
(   9-257, 9-258 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM