Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts Council
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a distribution of revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars to provide up to an aggregate amount of $1,000,000 in each fiscal year to the Special Fund for Preservation of Cultural Arts in Maryland; providing that the Maryland State Arts Council is entitled to a specified revenue distribution from the State admissions and amusement tax; requiring that the funds distributed to the Council be included in the Council's prior fiscal year appropriations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0377
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {619833/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {743026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {619833/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {743026/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501, 4-512, 4-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM