Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Bromwell, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, Wivell, and Afzali
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to increase the amount of credit that specified individuals without qualifying children may claim; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals 21 years of age and older to claim the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {945267/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679437/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {903223/1 Rejected (7-37)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {333128/1 Rejected (10-35)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {945267/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {679437/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {903223/1 Rejected (7-37) 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {333128/1 Rejected (10-35) 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8) 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM