Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the tax credit; requiring an entity to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before January 1 each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/29/2016 Text - First - Maryland Education Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM