Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified authorized providers and prescribers be registered with the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program before obtaining a specified new or renewal registration or by July 1, 2017, whichever is sooner; requiring that specified pharmacists be registered with the Program by a certain date; requiring specified prescribers and pharmacists to request and assess specified drug monitoring data under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0382
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-304 )
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-03, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-04.1, 21-2A-04.2, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07, 21-2A-08, 21-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM