Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Charles County to the Child Support Enforcement Administration of the Department of Human Resources; requiring that the employees be transferred in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring that specified transferred employees be given credit with the State for years of county employment for the purposes of determining specified retirement eligibility and also be subject to specified benefit selections in the Employees' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0347
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {213225/1 (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Reassigned to Appropriations 13
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Patterson) Adopted 31
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Floor Amendment {213225/1 (Delegate Patterson) Adopted 31
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 33
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Finance 32
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text - Chapter - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM