Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit Percentage
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing the maximum homestead property tax credit percentage in Baltimore County from 110% to 103%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0813
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit Percentage
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit Percentage
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM