Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Fraser-Hidalgo, Barkley, Beidle, Carr, Frush, Healey, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Smith, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that exploration and production waste is a controlled hazardous substance for the purpose of specified laws and regulations if it exhibits specified characteristics; prohibiting the Department of the Environment from exempting exploration and production waste from specified requirements relating to controlled hazardous substances; and prohibiting a person from accepting, receiving, collecting, storing, treating, transferring, or disposing of, in the State, waste from hydraulic fracturing.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1, 9-101, 9-293 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM