Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the scope of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians to provide education loan repayments to physician assistants who provide primary care in designated professional shortage areas under specified circumstances; and expanding the definition of "primary care" to include women's health.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545962/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {545962/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 44
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2014 3/21/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2801, 18-2803 through 18-2805 )
(   14-207, 15-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM