Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing from $24 to $10 fees for certified copies of specified certificates; and decreasing from $20 to $10 the portion of each fee collected by local health departments required to be transferred to the General Fund.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0389
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165263/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {165263/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM