Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Barron, Cassilly, Dumais, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Sanchez, Sydnor, B. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, under specified circumstances and subject to specified funding recommendations, postsecondary education and workforce training programs developed and recommended by the Correctional Education Council to provide inmates in correctional institutions in the Division of Correction with the requisite training, certifications, and experience to obtain careers in in-demand job sectors; authorizing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board to make a specified recommendation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {563527/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-29)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {563527/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (110-29) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
(   11-101, 11-901, 11-902, 11-903 )
(   9-3202, 9-3207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page