Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Barkley, Buckel, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Mautz, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain clerk to account for and pay into the General Fund of the State the entire fee received for a trader's license issued in a county or municipal corporation that selects a uniform license fee; exempting from the fee a visually handicapped applicant who meets certain standards and Blind Industries and Services; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to adopt certain regulations on the granting of exemptions from a certain inventory reporting requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643397/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {643397/1 Adopted 28
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 30
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Referred Finance 31
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1804, 17-1806 through 17-1808, 17-1807.1, 17-1813, 17-206, 17-302 )
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM