Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Acevero, Bagnall, Bartlett, Chang, Gilchrist, Guyton, Hettleman, Qi, Rogers, Smith, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an affirmative defense to certain crimes if a defendant committed an act as a result of being a victim of an act of another in violation of certain State and federal provisions of law prohibiting human trafficking; prohibiting a defendant from asserting the affirmative defense established by the Act unless the defendant provides a certain notice to the State's Attorney at least 10 days prior to trial; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {742510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {742510/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 12:46 PM