Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Arentz, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, Beidle, Carr, Healey, Jalisi, O'Donnell, and A. Washington
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Community Development Administration in the Department of Housing and Community Development to make, participate in making, and undertake a commitment for financial assistance to a homeowner for purchasing a homeowner's primary residence and making payments on the homeowner's student loan debt under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to determine the terms and qualifications of specified financial assistance to homeowners; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700517/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {700517/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance 48A
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-235, 4-237, 4-238, 4-240, 4-242 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM