Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 26-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, in Montgomery County, by October 1, 2020, a patrol vehicle used by a law enforcement officer who is a first responder or trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) and the operation and use of an automated external defibrillator (AED) to be equipped with an AED; providing that the Act does not apply to a vehicle being used by a law enforcement officer solely for transit purposes across or through Montgomery County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 26-17
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM