Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Arikan, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Bridges, Cardin, Conaway, Cox, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Grammer, Griffith, Haynes, Henson, Hill, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Malone, McComas, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pippy, Reznik, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, Washington, Williams, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to post on its website a free online course on the identification, prevention, and reporting of child abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-716 )
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM