Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for specified offenses relating to criminal gangs; prohibiting a criminal gang or an individual belonging to a criminal gang from receiving or investing specified proceeds in a specified manner; prohibiting criminal gangs and persons involved with criminal gangs from obtaining specified property under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-801 through 9-805, 9-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM