Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to include in certain policies requirements that a body-worn camera purchased or otherwise procured for use by a law enforcement officer on or after January 1, 2020, have certain video redaction software and automatically record and save 2 minutes of certain audio and video footage and that a law enforcement officer who is issued a body-worn camera activate the camera at the time of dispatch.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-511.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM