Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishment Licenses - Ownership and Operation Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue a funeral establishment license to a funeral establishment that will be owned and operated in accordance with specified provisions of law by a specified individual, a specified group of individuals, or a holder of a specified license or operated in accordance with specified provisions of law by a holder of a specified license; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-16)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774136/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (123-16) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {774136/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 57
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM