Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Ali, Angel, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Hettleman, C. Howard, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for contributions to a certain first-time homebuyer savings account during a taxable year and certain earnings on the account; providing that an account holder may claim the subtraction modification under certain circumstances; providing that transfers of money to or from the account are subject to certain requirements and limitations; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0972
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0230 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM