Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a manufacturer that ships or transports a handgun for sale, rental, or transfer in Baltimore City to ensure that when ammunition is fired from the handgun, the handgun operates in a manner that includes copying the characters onto the shell casing of the ammunition by means of microstamping, and to certify to licensees that the handgun is capable of microstamping; requiring a certain licensee to report to the Baltimore Police Department at a certain time that a certain manufacturer has complied with a certain requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-131, 5-133.1, 5-134.1, 5-134.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM