Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending indefinitely the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources; repealing the limit on the period of time during which energy from a Tier 2 renewable source is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard; applying the Act to all renewable portfolio standard compliance years that begin on or after January 1, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0316
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/5/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page