Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Anderson, Carr, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Prince George's County AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program; authorizing the establishment of Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs; requiring a local health department or a specified community-based organization to apply to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and a local health officer for authorization to operate a Program; requiring the Department and a local health officer to approve or deny an application within 60 days of receiving a completed application; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0097
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {166687/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-901 through 24-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM