Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a political subdivision to require inspections of specified multifamily dwellings with balconies at least every 10 years, beginning no later than 10 years after the balcony is constructed, to ensure that each balcony meets requirements of the local housing code or the Minimum Livability Code; authorizing a political subdivision to conduct inspections, authorize a third party to conduct the inspections, or require a professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0018
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0196 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM