Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education and Private Career Schools - Instructional Spending - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Acevero, Bridges, Crosby, D.M. Davis, Forbes, J. Lewis, Lopez, McIntosh, Metzgar, Solomon, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools to report certain information on revenues and spending to the Maryland Higher Education Commission on or before June 30 each year; annually requiring that, on or after July 1, 2022, in order to maintain approval to operate in the State and enroll certain students, the institutions and schools must submit a certain plan and provide certain refunds under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education and Private Career Schools - Instructional Spending - Requirements
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-210 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page