Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderton, Aumann, Buckel, Ebersole, Hayes, Hornberger, Morgan, Platt, Rose, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment, not to exceed $50,000 or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity, made in a qualified innovation business; requiring a qualified investor to meet specified requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the credit; applying the Act to specified taxable years after December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0789 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page