Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a new article to the Annotated Code of Maryland, to be designated and known as the "Local Government Article", to revise, restate, and recodify the laws of the State relating to local governments; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   140 through 143, 181 through 183 )
(   14-301 through 14-303, 14-304, 14-305 through 14-312, 14-701, 14-702, 18-201 )
(   17-441 through 17-446, 17-449 through 17-454 )
(   2-309, 5-507, 5-508, 5-509, 5-510, 5-511, 5-5A-01, 5-5A-02 )
(   4-128, 4-129 )
(   10-101, 10-102, 10-201 through 10-206, 10-301 through 10-330, 1-1001, 1-1002, 1-1005 through 1-1014, 1-101, 1-1017, 1-1101 through 1-1110, 11-101 through 11-103, 1-1201 through 1-1209, 11-201 through 11-211, 1-1301 through 1-1308, 11-301 through 11-308, 11-401, 11-402, 1-201 through 1-205, 12-101 through 12-108, 12-201 through 12-208, 12-301 through 12-303, 12-401 through 12-412, 12-501 through 12-508, 12-511 through 12-523, 12-526 through 12-539, 12-601 through 12-603, 12-606 through 12-613, 12-616 through 12-618, 12-621, 12-701, 12-801 through 12-806, 12-901 through 12-903, 1-301 through 1-306, 13-101 through 13-109, 13-112 through 13-134, 13-201 through 13-205, 13-301 through 13-312, 13-315, 13-401 through 13-410, 13-501 through 13-508, 13-601 through 13-606, 13-701 through 13-705, 13-801 through 13-805, 13-901 through 13-907, 13-910 through 13-912, 13-915 through 13-918, 13-921 through 13-923, 1-401 through 1-403, 1-501 through 1-504, 1-601 through 1-611, 16-101 through 16-116, 16-201 through 16-205, 16-301 through 16-309, 16-401 through 16-407, 16-501 through 16-504, 1-701 through 1-709, 17-101 through 17-104, 17-201 through 17-208, 17-301 through 17-309, 17-312 through 17-314, 1-801 through 1-804, 18-101 through 18-121, 18-201 through 18-206, 18-301, 1-901 through 1-903, 19-101 through 19-106, 19-201, 19-204 through 19-208, 19-211 through 19-221, 19-224, 19-227 through 19-233, 19-236, 19-301 through 19-309, 19-401, 19-501 through 19-510, 19-601 through 19-612, 19-615 through 19-616, 19-701 through 19-703, 19-801 through 19-811, 19-901 through 19-908, 20-101 through 20-104, 20-107 through 20-110, 20-113 through 20-118, 20-121 through 20-124, 20-127, 20-201, 20-202, 20-301 through 20-309, 20-401 through 20-428, 20-431 through 20-436, 20-501, 20-502, 20-601 through 20-609, 20-701 through 20-706, 20-801 through 20-806, 21-101 through 21-106, 21-201 through 21-214, 21-301 through 21-306, 21-401 through 21-404, 21-407 through 21-422, 21-501 through 21-516, 21-519 through 21-523, 21-601 through 21-603, 21-606 through 21-608, 21-611 through 21-618, 21-621 through 21-629, 21-632 through 21-634, 21-637, 21-638, 21-641, 21-644, 21-701, 21-702, 21-801 through 21-806, 24-101 through 24-106, 25-1001 through 25-1003, 25-101 through 25-104, 25-1101, 25-1102, 25-201 through 25-206, 25-301 through 25-310, 25-401 through 25-405, 25-501 through 25-512, 25-601 through 25-604, 25-701 through 25-702, 25-801 through 25-809, 25-901, 25-902, 26-1001 through 26-1003, 26-101 through 26-107, 26-1101, 26-1102, 26-201 through 26-206, 26-301 through 26-309, 26-401 through 26-404, 26-501 through 26-513, 26-601, 26-602, 26-701, 26-702, 26-801 through 26-807, 26-901, 26-902, 27-101 through 27-105, 27-201 through 27-205, 27-301 through 27-310, 27-401 through 27-405, 27-501, 27-502, 27-601 through 27-603, 27-701 through 27-710, 27-801, 27-901, 27-902, 28-101 through 28-107, 28-201 through 28-209, 29-101 through 29-109, 30-101 through 30-108, 4-101 through 4-111, 4-201 through 4-216, 4-301 through 4-314, 4-401 through 4-416, 4-501 through 4-509, 5-101 through 5-106, 5-201 through 5-217, 5-301 through 5-302, 5-401 through 5-431, 6-101 through 6-115, 9-101 through 9-113, 9-201 through 9-207, 9-301 through 9-315, 9-401 through 9-406, 9-501 through 9-516 )
(   7-106, 7-107 )
(   4-316, 8-131.2, 8-222 )
(   4-407, 8-609.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM