Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified farm a credit, for tax years 2017 through 2019, of up to $5,000 against the State income tax; providing that the credit is equal to 50% of the value of an eligible food donation or 75% of the value of donated certified organic produce; providing that the amount of tax credit certificates may not exceed $250,000 per year; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with the Comptroller, to report to the Governor and General Assembly on specified matters by January 1 of specified years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-19)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-19) 35
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 34
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM