Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Beidle, Cassilly, Folden, Holmes, Jalisi, Kipke, McCray, Otto, Robinson, Szeliga, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a landlord who uses a written lease to collect certain fees and charges as rent under certain conditions; providing that the Act applies only if the written lease used by a landlord includes a certain provision and provides a certain notice; requiring a lease to include notice of the ratio utility billing system used to allocate certain charges, under certain circumstances; prohibiting a landlord from filing a complaint for repossession if the only unpaid fee or charge is for water and is under $50; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208, 8-401, 8-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM