Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities, Throwback Rule, and Combined Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Palakovich Carr, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, Wells, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax imposed on certain pass-through entities; requiring each pass-through entity to pay the tax imposed with respect to certain shares of certain nonresident and nonresident entity members of the pass-through entity; requiring that certain sales of tangible personal property be attributed to the State for apportionment purposes under the corporate income tax if the corporation is not taxable in the state of the purchaser; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1051 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-44)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Throwback Rule
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {145560/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities, Throwback Rule, and Combined Reporting
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (91-44) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-219 )
(   10-102.1, 10-311, 10-402, 10-402.1, 10-701.1, 10-703, 10-706, 10-811, 2-613.1, 2-614 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page