Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the terms of a trust do not prevail over certain periods of limitation in bringing a judicial action; prohibiting a beneficiary from bringing a judicial action against a trustee for breach of trust more than 1 year after the date the beneficiary or the representative of the beneficiary is sent a certain report; providing that a certain report adequately discloses the existence of a potential claim for breach of trust for certain purposes; providing that the Act does not limit certain actions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
(   14.5-105, 14.5-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page