Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali and Mosby
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting tax on real property in Baltimore City from accruing after the tax has been in arrears for at least 3 years and the property has not been sold at tax sale during the 3-year period; prohibiting certain interest for unpaid tax accruing on real property in Baltimore City if the property meets certain conditions; prohibiting certain penalties for unpaid tax accruing on real property in Baltimore City if the property meets certain conditions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and Penalties
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-604, 14-605, 14-703, 14-801, 14-808, 14-820, 6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM