Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, if a defendant who has posted a bail bond is taken into custody and deported by a specified agency of the federal government because of the defendant's immigration status, the bond shall be null and void; providing that any bond that becomes null and void under the Act shall be returned to the surety and the surety shall have no liability with respect to the bond; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0720
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0551 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {142716/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-14)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {142716/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (121-14) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM