Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "convicted of a crime of violence" and "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include probation before judgment for crimes of violence for the purpose of specified provisions of law that limit a person's right to possess a firearm or obtain a regulated firearm dealer's license based on prior convictions; and providing that the definitions of "convicted of a crime of violence" and "convicted of a disqualifying crime" do not include probation before judgment for assault in the second degree.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM