Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Frush, and Gutierrez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Potomac Compact for Fair Representation; providing that a party state is not required to comply with the Compact under certain circumstances; establishing the Independent Congressional Districting Commission; requiring the Commission to consider the adoption of a certain congressional districting plan for a party state, draw and adopt a certain congressional districting plan for a party state before a certain deadline, operate in a certain manner, and solicit public feedback; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0622 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-06, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page