Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons – Court–Appointed Attorneys
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to pay reasonable attorney's fees incurred in representing an alleged disabled person who is indigent in a petition for the appointment of a guardian of the property of the person; and requiring the court, under certain circumstances, to appoint, for the alleged disabled person, an attorney who has contracted with the Maryland Department of Human Services, subject to a certain exception.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons – Court–Appointed Attorneys
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {582510/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons – Court–Appointed Attorneys
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page