Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Civil Causes of Action - Theft
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a civil cause of action for damages from theft; establishing that a person may recover certain costs under a certain cause of action; requiring a person claiming injury to make a certain written demand prior to filing an action for damages, subject to an exception; requiring a certain person to give a person who complies with a written demand a certain written release from civil liability; and authorizing a court to award punitive damages for a certain cause of action.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Civil Causes of Action - Theft
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Civil Causes of Action - Theft
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-2201 through 3-2203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page