Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Shoppers Discount Plan
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to offer a shoppers toll discount plan that allows, on Sundays through Thursdays, 20 crossings of the Francis Scott Key Bridge within a period of 90 days for a fee of $20, subject to mandatory renewal for 1 year.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Shoppers Discount Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Shoppers Discount Plan
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM