Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Barkley, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Glass, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, Norman, O'Donnell, Parrott, Ready, Schulz, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Tarrant, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the office of the Inspector General; specifying qualifications that an individual must meet to be eligible for election to the office; providing that the Inspector General is subject to removal by the General Assembly under specified circumstances; specifying the duties and powers of the Inspector General; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State of Maryland for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0574 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM