Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Shoemaker, Acevero, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Beitzel, Boteler, Boyce, Branch, Bridges, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Cassilly, Charkoudian, Charles, Clark, Conaway, Corderman, Cox, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, M. Fisher, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Hartman, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Impallaria, Ivey, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Johnson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McIntosh, McKay, Metzgar, Miller, Moon, Morgan, Otto, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Pippy, Proctor, Qi, Queen, Reilly, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Szeliga, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reclassifying, as a felony instead of a misdemeanor, the crime of selling, bartering, trading, or offering to sell, barter, or trade a minor for money, property, or anything else of value.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony
(   3-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page