Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Labeling
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale, Eckardt, Afzali, Aumann, Beidle, Costa, Frank, George, Kipke, Krebs, McConkey, W. Miller, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Listing synthetic cannabinoids on Schedule I to designate controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; prohibiting a person from selling, purchasing, or possessing an herbal or botanical product containing a synthetic substance substantially similar to synthetic cannabinoids, unless the chemical structure of each synthetic substance contained in the product and the date of manufacture of the product is identified on the label of the product; establishing criminal penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-402, 5-618.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM