Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Brooks, Chang, Conaway, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Lam, Oaks, Patterson, B. Robinson, Sydnor, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified vehicles used by a law enforcement agency to transport arrestees or other passengers be equipped with audio and video recording devices in passenger areas of the vehicles; requiring that the audio and video recording devices be tested before the use of specified vehicles; and prohibiting the use of specified vehicles for transport if the audio and video recording devices are not properly functioning.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101, 22-414.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM