Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Inspector General
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Barkley, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Glass, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, Norman, O'Donnell, Parrott, Schulz, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Tarrant, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that there is an Inspector General of the State; establishing the Office of the Inspector General; requiring the Inspector General to examine and investigate the management and affairs of units and conduct audits of the units; authorizing the Inspector General to investigate specified matters; requiring that a unit cooperate fully with the Inspector General under specified circumstances; requiring that the Inspector General have access to specified documents of a unit under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0570 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-402 )
(   7.5-101 through 7.5-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM