Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Bromwell, Chang, Crosby, Cullison, Krebs, McKay, Morgan, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that certain service contracts entered into by the State contain a certain work verification clause; requiring the work verification clause to require the contractor to use certain work verification software for a certain purpose, specify that the State is liable only for the cost of certain work that is verified in a certain manner, specify the requirements of the work verification software, and require that certain data be stored for a least 7 years and be provided to the State without cost under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Service Contracts - Work Verification Clause
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM