Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Dispositions and Summary Suspensions - Time Periods
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an agency or the Office of Administrative Hearings to dispose of a contested case within 90 days from a certain evidentiary hearing; authorizing a certain named party to provide certain written notice that a decision is due; establishing that a certain decision shall be deemed in favor of the named party under certain circumstances; and requiring a certain unit to issue a certain order on a certain summary suspension within 30 days from the date of the summary suspension.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0297
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Administrative Procedure Act - Dispositions and Summary Suspensions - Time Periods
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210, 10-226 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM