Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit in the Office of the Attorney General for the purpose of protecting seniors and vulnerable adults from financial crimes under § 8-801 of the Criminal Law Article; authorizing the Unit to bring civil actions for damages against certain persons; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2021, to appropriate at least $450,000 for the Unit; requiring the Unit to use the funds to hire new staff and investigate and assist prosecution by the Unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-204, 14-4201 through 14-4204 )
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM